FL H0473 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for DHSMV to create Corporate License Plate Program; requires that specified minimum fees be paid by applicants & corporate sponsors for such applications; requires that corporate sponsor meet specified eligibility requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate License Plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-22 On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 12:05 pm, 306 HOB --Workshopped
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 45
2011-02-07 Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 45
2011-01-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0716 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008052Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback