FL H0469 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court to include interest in final judgment in action from which plaintiff recovers economic or noneconomic damages; specifies dates from which interest accrues; requires interest on attorney fees & costs, if recovered; specifies rate; provides applicability.
Title
Prejudgment Interest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-23 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 4 |
2017-02-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 02/23/17, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0334 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar