FL H0467 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires game promotion operator who provides electronic devices that reveal or display results of game promotion that offers certain prize amounts to file certain information with DACS; prohibits department from accepting filings from certain persons against whom there is criminal or civil adjudication or unsatisfied civil judgment for certain violations; requires game promotion operator to provide certain certifications regarding game promotion software & remit to department annual fees for each electronic device or computer terminal; prohibits use of mechanical or electromechanical reels in connection with game promotion.
Title
Game Promotion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 47 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 47 | |
2011-10-24 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/467 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0467/BillText/Filed/HTML |