FL H0461 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOE to develop model communication plan to be used in development of IEP for deaf or hard-of-hearing students; requires DOE to disseminate model to each school district & provide technical assistance.
Title
Deaf and Hard-of-Hearing Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#66 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#66 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Chapter No. 2013-84 | |
2013-05-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-05-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 2 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 150 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2013-04-11 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (871215) |
2013-04-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/13 |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/22/13, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2013-03-13 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | CS referred to Education Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-12 | House | CS by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-12 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-12 | House | CS by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-08 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Choice and Innovation Subcommittee, 03/12/13, 1:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0150 (Similar To) 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 461 (Ch. 2013-84)