FL H0459 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Florida Building Code must require that facilities that provide dialysis services to have an operational emergency power source.
Title
Emergency Power for Facilities Providing Dialysis Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S830 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/459 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/459/BillText/Filed/PDF |