FL H0459 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain information related to agency contracts is not confidential or exempt from public records requirements; removes or revises numerous provisions relating to exemptions from public records requirements for trade secrets.
Title
Public Records
Sponsors
House Government Accountability Committee | House Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee | Rep. Ralph Massullo [R] | Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] |
Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#657 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules |
2018-02-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-21 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 2 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time 652 |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (435049, 795813) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18 |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-12 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-08 | House | CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/08/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-19 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time 359 |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-17 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H461 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S956 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S958 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S956 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S958 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 4472 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 0713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 07135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 0104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 4401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 943 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 0943 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 776 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9627 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 326 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
364 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
365 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
367 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
368 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 24075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 3035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 91196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 0121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 2015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
520 | 9965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 5558 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 544 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
573 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 76 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 4212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 4213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 84195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 884 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9936 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0628 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 0591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
663 | 533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
73 | 0155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
815 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
815 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |