FL H0459 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides legislative intent; provides duties of Office of Minority Health; requires office to submit annual report to Governor & Legislature; requires consideration of minority health issues in state policy & planning; requires DOH, AHCA, DEA, DOC, & DJJ to take minority health issues into consideration in their annual planning; requires that boards or advisory boards of DOH, AHCA, & DEA seek equal representation of certain members; provides for responsibility & coordination with EOG & other state agencies.
Title
Office of Minority Health
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Mia Jones [D] | Rep. Mark Pafford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 46 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 46 | |
2011-10-24 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/459 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0459/BillText/Filed/HTML |