FL H0455 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Florida Overtime Act of 2015"; revises number of hours of labor that comprise legal day's work; revises rates of overtime compensation for labor performed in excess of certain of hours of work; provides that commuting to & from certain locations is not part of day's work; prohibits employer from requiring employee to continue working after employee's shift under certain circumstances; prohibits employer from paying employee for less than amount of contracted hours worked by employee; provides penalties; provides that act does not affect employer's liability under Workers' Compensation Law.
Title
Labor Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2015-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0890 (Same As) 2015-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/455 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0455/BillText/Filed/PDF |