FL H0447 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for assessment of ad valorem taxes & non-ad valorem assessments against certain common elements of subdivision; prohibits such common elements from being prorated by property appraiser & included in assessment of lots within subdivision.
Title
Ad Valorem Taxes and Non-Ad Valorem Assessments Against Subdivision Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1206 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/447 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0447/BillText/Filed/PDF |