FL H0423 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-240

Summary

Codifies, amends, reenacts, & repeals special acts relating to district; provides for warrants by chairperson, treasurer, or certain other persons; provides that authority may hold books open for period after fiscal year; provides that authority shall comply with general law for cost of construction & supplies; provides for execution of documents & examination of claims, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seminole County Port Authority, Seminole County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-240
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01284
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00943; Read 3rd time -SJ 00943; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00943
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00866; Referred to Rules -SJ 00866
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00904; Read 3rd time -HJ 00904; CS passed; YEAS 105 NAYS 2 -HJ 00904
2010-03-15 CS read 1st time on 03/15/10 -HJ 00277; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00300
2010-03-10 CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00279
2010-03-08 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/10/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-02 -HJ 00159; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Original reference(s) removed: Finance & Tax Council; CS referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00163; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00163
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00041; On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/03/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall; CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00168; CS read 1st time on
2010-02-18 Original reference(s) removed: Finance & Tax Council; CS referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-02-15 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-02-03 CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2010-01-27 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/03/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2009-12-18 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-11-30 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback