FL H0421 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Directs DEP to procure specified technology for purpose of long-term cleanup of water bodies.
Title
Long-term Cleanup of Water Bodies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-14 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-10 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-08 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-10-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S834 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government