FL H0421 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits holding child being prosecuted as adult in jail or other facility intended or used for detention of adults; provides exception; requires court to consider specified factors in making certain determination; removes provisions under which court is required to order delivery of child to jail or other adult facility.
Title
Detention of Children
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Ramon Alexander [D] | Rep. James Bush [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] |
Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-03 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-10-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S618 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H285 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S610 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
H285 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S610 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice