FL H0417 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires commercial breeders to comply with certain federal animal welfare standards & DBPR rules that require compliance with future amendments to standards; requires commercial breeders to register with DBPR; provides for registration applications & fees; provides for inspection & annual reinspection of locations where commercial breeders house animals; provides for expiration & renewal of registrations; prohibits certain acts by commercial breeders; specifies that certain proceedings are governed by APA; authorizes DBPR to adopt rules.
Title
Commercial Breeding of Animals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1596 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/417 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0417/BillText/Filed/PDF |