FL H0413 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for obtaining chiropractic medicine faculty certificate; authorizes Board of Chiropractic Medicine to approve continuing education courses sponsored by chiropractic colleges under certain circumstances; revises requirements for person who desires to be licensed as chiropractic physician; requires that chiropractic physician preserve identity of funds or property of patient in excess of specified amount; provides that services rendered by certified chiropractic physician's assistant under indirect supervision may occur only at supervising chiropractic physician's address of record; revises provisions relating to proprietorship by persons other than licensed chiropractic physicians.
Title
Chiropractic Medicine
Sponsors
Rep. Marti Coley [R] | Rep. Joseph Gibbons [D] | House Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] |
Rep. Steven Perman [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#119 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1069 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1069 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713 | |
2012-03-09 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1425 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 1424 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 1082 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1082 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1028 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 455 | |
2012-02-02 | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 455 | |
2012-01-31 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/02/12, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-11 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 217 | |
2012-01-11 | Favorable by Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 217 | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 166 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 41 | |
2012-01-09 | On Committee agenda-- Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee, 01/11/12, 8:30 am, 306 HOB | |
2011-12-14 | Now in Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee -HJ 169 | |
2011-12-14 | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2011-12-12 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-12-06 | CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 178 | |
2011-11-29 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee, 12/06/11, 8:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 41 | |
2011-10-19 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
460 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
460 | 4062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
460 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
460 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
460 | 4165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
460 | 4167 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |