FL H0411 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for firesafety system plans held by agency, exemption from public records & public meetings requirements for information relating to firesafety systems for certain properties & meetings relating to such systems & information, & exemption from public meetings requirements for portions of meetings that would reveal such plans held by agency; provides for retroactive application, for future legislative review & repeal, & statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records and Public Meetings/Firesafety Systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#617 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-146
2018-04-06 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for SB 738
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HouseCS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-01-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-25HouseCS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-01-25HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-24HouseCS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-17HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-17HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-01HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S738 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 411

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
281301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2860113Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback