FL H0405 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to report certain criminal activity & enforcement of certain regulations to FDLE & DHSMV; provides requirements for examination questions pertaining to traffic regulations relating to legally blind & mobility impaired persons; requires certain driver education programs & law enforcement officer basic skills course to include study of traffic laws to assist legally blind & mobility impaired persons.
Title
Persons with Disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Baxley [R] | Rep. Rick Kriseman [D] | Rep. Mark Pafford [D] | Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
Rep. Dwayne Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 40 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 41 | |
2011-10-18 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/405 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0405/BillText/Filed/HTML |