FL H0403 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes courts to assess & award attorney fees & costs & damages in certain civil actions filed against local governments; requires local governments to prepare business impact statement before adoption of proposed ordinances; specifies requirements for posting & content of statement; requires counties & municipalities to suspend enforcement of certain ordinances subject of certain legal actions; requires courts to give priority to certain cases; specifies factors court must consider in determining whether ordinance is arbitrary or unreasonable provides declaration of important state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Ordinances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-01 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-01HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-12-01HouseReported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-12-01HouseFavorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-11-23HouseAdded to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2021-11-05HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-10-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S280 (Same As) 2022-01-14 - On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12566Amended CodeSee Bill Text
125675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1632517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1660411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37680Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497270Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8470134Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback