FL H0397 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Commercialization Credit Transfer Program; provides legislative findings; authorizes DOR to share certain confidential information with OTTED; adds certified credits to list of credits available against state corporate income tax; redefines term "adjusted federal income" in relation to net operating losses transferred & payments received for certified credit; provides for allocation of financial assistance as income in this state; provides purpose, intent, goals, & objectives, etc. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Economic Development
Sponsors
Rep. Lake Ray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 39 | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 39 | |
2011-01-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0774 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0264 () 2010-12-15 - Filed
S0264 () 2010-12-15 - Filed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/397 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0397/BillText/Filed/HTML |