FL H0389 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing school districts to make menstrual hygiene products available, at no charge, in schools within the district and at certain locations within such schools; specifying requirements for the menstrual hygiene products and the dispensers of such products; requiring participating schools to notify students of the availability and locations of such products; encouraging school districts to partner with specified organizations to supply and maintain such menstrual hygiene products, etc.
Title
Menstrual Hygiene Products in Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#488 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#41 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#150 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Education Quality Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#41 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#150 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Education Quality Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Chapter No. 2023-100 | |
2023-05-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-04 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2023-05-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 110, NAYS 0 |
2023-05-04 | House | Amendment 427820 Concur |
2023-05-04 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2023-05-04 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-04 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (427820) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/04/23 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023) |
2023-04-11 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2023-04-07 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2023-03-31 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-31 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-31 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-31 | House | Original reference removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-30 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-30 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Favorable with CS by Education Quality Subcommittee |
2023-03-27 | House | PCS added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S334 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Pre-K -12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 389 (Ch. 2023-100)