FL H0385 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes burden of proof that claimant must meet in certain damage claims against health care providers based on death or personal injury; allows prospective medical malpractice defendant to interview claimant's treating health care providers without presence of claimant or claimant's legal representative; requires prospective defendant to provide claimant notice specified period before such interview.
Title
Medical Malpractice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 631 | |
2012-02-14 | CS/CS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 598 | |
2012-02-14 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-13 | CS/CS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 3 -HJ 601 | |
2012-02-09 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/12, 1:45 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 317 | |
2012-01-30 | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 304 | |
2012-01-30 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-27 | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 -HJ 310 | |
2012-01-25 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/27/12, 8:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/25/12, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB --Temporarily deferred | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 166 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 39 | |
2012-01-03 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 169 | |
2012-01-03 | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2011-12-09 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-12-07 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2 -HJ 177 | |
2011-11-30 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 12/07/11, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 39 | |
2011-10-18 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
766 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |