FL H0371 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to establish federal catastrophe pool to spread risk & reduce cost of insurance premiums & assist insurance companies & residents of state & nation when catastrophic natural disasters strike.
Title
Federal Catastrophe Pool
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-22 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-11-07 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/371 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/371/BillText/Filed/PDF |