FL H0367 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for enactment of Agreement Among States to Elect President by National Popular Vote; provides method by which state may become member state; requires statewide popular election for President & Vice President of U.S.; establishes procedure for appointing presidential electors in member states; provides that agreement becomes effective upon occurrence of specified actions; provides for withdrawal of member state; requires notification of member states when agreement takes effect in nonmember state or when member state withdraws from agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1374 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Introduced

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback