FL H0367 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-17)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-17)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises Next Generation Sunshine State Standards for financial literacy instruction; deletes obsolete requirement relating to cost analysis for implementing separate course in financial literacy; provides that credit requirements for high school graduation & standard diploma include separate course in financial literacy; requires DOE to work with nonprofit organizations to develop standards & curriculum & professional development guidelines for teaching financial literacy.
Title
Financial Literacy Instruction in the Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in K-12 Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-12-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0212 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
H7031 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-39, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1226 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
H7031 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-39, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1226 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/367 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0367/BillText/Filed/PDF |