FL H0363 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act "Ava's Law"; requires that every female arrested & not released on bond within 72 hours after arrest be administered pregnancy test within specified timeframe, upon her request; requires that, if pregnant woman is convicted of crime & sentenced to incarceration of any length, sentencing judge provide her opportunity to defer imposed sentence until specified time after delivery; authorizes sentencing judge to order pregnant woman to comply with certain terms & conditions during deferral; requires that woman be offered, & receive upon her request, specified services within 10 days after deferral ends; requires collection & reporting of specified information.
Title
Pregnant Women in Custody
Sponsors
Rep. Dianne Hart [D] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Yvonne Hayes Hinson [D] |
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Felicia Simone Robinson [D] | Rep. Susan Valdes [D] | Rep. Marie Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-10-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S630 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
907 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
925 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/363 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/363/BillText/Filed/PDF |