FL H0363 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person from knowingly & willfully attempting to obtain, obtaining, or disclosing privileged communication or protected information; provides exemption from criminal liability for employees, board members, or volunteers of crime stoppers organization in certain circumstances; provides immunity from civil liability for certain actions by specified persons.
Title
Privileged Communications Made to Crime Stoppers Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#133 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#133 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Chapter No. 2021-21 | |
2021-05-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-21 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-21 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 512 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1868 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-03-29 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-03-24 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-23 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-03 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1868 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 363 (Ch. 2021-21)