FL H0361 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises legislative intent concerning obligations of bail bond agent; revises commitments & obligations of bail bond agent; revises circumstances that constitute breach by bail bond agent & under which surety bond deposited as bail must be forfeited; revises circumstances that require forfeiture to be discharged; specifies that certain provisions concerning cancellation of bond do not apply if bond is forfeited within specified period; provides that original appearance bond does not guarantee placement in court-ordered program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail Bonds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#382 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27 Chapter No. 2017-168
2017-06-26 Approved by Governor
2017-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-02HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-05-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2017-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 680
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Rules
2017-05-02SenateReceived
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Rules
2017-05-02SenateIn Messages
2017-05-02HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2017-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-21HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2017-04-21HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-20HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2017-04-18HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/20/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-03-27HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2017-03-27HouseFavorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3
2017-03-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/27/17, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-03-20HouseNow in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2017-03-16HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-16HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-15HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-03-13HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-01-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0680 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 361 (Ch. 2017-168)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
903045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90328Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90331Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback