FL H0351 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes supervising physician to authorize licensed physician assistant to perform services under direction of licensed podiatric physician; specifies supervising physician is liable for performance & acts & omissions of physician assistant; authorizes Board of Podiatric Medicine to require specified number of continuing education hours related to safe & effective prescribing of controlled substances; provides for governance of podiatric physicians who are supervising medical assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Podiatric Medicine

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#438 (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Health Policy
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-26SenateReceived
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateIn Messages
2020-02-13HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 3
2020-02-13HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-02-12HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-06HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/12/20
2020-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-03HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-02-03HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-30HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/30/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-14HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-25HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-11-25HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-11-25HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-11-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-11-13HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2019-11-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-10-23HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-10-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S744 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
458347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583485Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
461007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4610145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4610155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62427Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback