FL H0349 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution to allow proposal of laws by initiative without legislative or gubernatorial approval; prescribe requirements for subject matter, proposal, & approval of such initiatives; require extraordinary vote of each house of Legislature to amend or repeal laws approved by voters; require Legislature to adopt procedures for initiatives; provide for Supreme Court review of initiative petitions; require ballot statements for such initiatives to include statement of economic impact.
Title
Legislation by Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Rules and Policy Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1332 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/349 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0349/BillText/Filed/PDF |