FL H0347 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1059
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1059
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Board of Governors of SUS & State Board of Education to adopt regulations & rules, respectively, that enable U.S. Armed Forces servicemembers to earn college credit for college-level training & education acquired in military.
Title
College Credit for Military Training and Education Courses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#881 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#881 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1059 | |
2012-02-29 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 714 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 714 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Withdrawn from Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Higher Education; Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations; Budget -SJ 694 | |
2012-02-24 | Received -SJ 682 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 782 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 781 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 730 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-17 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 683 | |
2012-02-16 | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 683 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/16/12, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 601 | |
2012-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/14/12, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-03 | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 466 | |
2012-02-03 | Favorable by Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 466 | |
2012-02-01 | On Committee agenda-- Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee, 02/03/12, 9:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-24 | Now in Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee -HJ 282 | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 282 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- K-20 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/24/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 35 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 35 | |
2011-10-12 | Filed |