FL H0337 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes county to provide certain services & facilities outside boundaries of municipality without express consent of municipality's governing body under certain circumstances; prohibits municipality from extending its corporate powers within unincorporated areas of county without express consent of county's governing body.
Title
Local Government Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Now in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-17 | House | Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2015-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 02/17/15, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 02/09/15, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall --Temporarily postponed |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0442 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
180 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/337 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0337/BillText/Filed/PDF |