FL H0337 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets fees & costs for dissolution or registration of domestic partnership; requires DOH to examine certificates of domestic partnership & dissolution reports; requires clerk to transmit declarations of domestic partnership; authorizes DOH to issue certified copy of certain vital records to domestic partner; includes domestic partnership within domestic violence provisions; requires DOH to create & distribute forms; provides jurisdiction over partnership proceedings, etc.
Title
Domestic Partnerships
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Clemens [D] | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Rick Kriseman [D] | Rep. Mark Pafford [D] |
Rep. Ari Porth [D] | Rep. Scott Randolph [D] | Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D] | Rep. Richard Steinberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 33 | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 34 | |
2011-01-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0348 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 0085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 0255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 1031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/337 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0337/BillText/Filed/HTML |