FL H0335 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for enactment of Agreement Among States to Elect President by National Popular Vote; provides method by which state may become member state; requires statewide popular election for President & Vice President of U.S.; establishes procedure for appointing presidential electors in member states; provides that agreement becomes effective upon occurrence of specified actions; provides for withdrawal of member state; requires notification of member states when agreement takes effect in nonmember state or when member state withdraws from agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-23HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-10-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S908 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback