FL H0331 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes person to use force, except deadly force, in defense of property; provides that person does not have duty to retreat if person is in certain place; requires, rather than authorizes, law enforcement agency to investigate use of force; deletes provision that prohibits law enforcement agency from arresting person for using force; authorizes, rather than requires, court to award attorney fees & other expenses to defendant who used force; deletes provisions that make justifiable use of force available to aggressor who initially provokes use of force; provides additional circumstances in which justifiable use of force is not available; directs FDLE to collect data on incidents concerning alleged justifiable use of force; requires law enforcement agencies to report incidents & cases in which justifiable use of force claimed.
Title
Self-Defense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0136 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
776 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/331 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0331/BillText/Filed/PDF |