FL H0331 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Next Generation Sunshine State Standards to include financial literacy in core curricular content of economics; includes study of financial literacy in public school required instruction; provides that credit requirement in economics for high school graduation includes instruction in financial literacy; replaces term "vocational-preparatory" instruction with term "applied academics for adult education" instruction with respect to adult general education; conforms provisions relating to career education programs; authorizes district school boards & Florida College System institution boards of trustees to vary certain intended learning outcomes; deletes certain courses as priorities in provision of adult education program academic services; requires students entering adult general education programs to complete "Action Steps to Employment" activities.
Title
Career and Adult Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#877 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Higher Education; Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Budget -SJ 814 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 814 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 780 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 779 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 729 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-17 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 683 | |
2012-02-16 | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 683 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/16/12, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 601 | |
2012-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/14/12, 11:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-01 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 454 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 454 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- K-20 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 3:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 34 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 34 | |
2011-10-11 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 428 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 429 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 433 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 93 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |