FL H0323 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Withdrawn from HHS Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Withdrawn from HHS Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain criteria of program by requiring that public education & outreach initiative & professional education programs use guidelines currently employed by U.S. Centers for Disease Control & Prevention rather than U.S. Preventive Services Task Force.
Title
Breast Cancer Detection/Treatment Referral Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Withdrawn from HHS Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to HHS Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-21 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0802 () 2011-03-15 - Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 226
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/323 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0323/BillText/Filed/HTML |