FL H0321 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges U.S. Congress to encourage Dominican Republic to reinstate citizenship to Dominicans of Haitian Descent.
Title
Reinstatement of Citizenship for Dominicans of Haitian Descent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-10-30 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-10-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0482 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
S1452 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
S1792 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died, not introduced
S1452 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
S1792 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died, not introduced
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/321 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0321/BillText/Filed/PDF |