FL H0303 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides requirements for insurance, drivers, agents, fares, receipts, digital network, & reports for luxury ground transportation companies; provides fines for noncompliance; authorizes automobile liability insurance policies to exclude coverage for losses & injuries under certain circumstances; provides that specified automobile insurers have a right of contribution against other insurers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Luxury Ground Transportation Companies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-16HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627747Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback