FL H0301 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals references to Constitution Revision Commission, powers of chair, & assistance by state & local agencies.
Title
Repeal of Constitution Revision Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] | Rep. Mike Beltran [R] | Rep. Cord Byrd [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] |
Rep. Juan Fernandez-Barquin [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#397 (Y: 93 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-01-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-01-22 | House | Passed; YEAS 93 NAYS 25 |
2020-01-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/22/20 |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-16 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 2 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/16/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-12-09 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-12-09 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 12/09/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-11-15 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-11-14 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2019-11-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 11/14/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-10-07 | House | Filed |