FL H0301 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires independent sanctioning authority for youth athletic teams & FHSAA to adopt guidelines, bylaws, & policies relating to nature & risk of concussion & head injury in youth athletes; requires informed consent for participation in practice or competition; requires removal from practice or competition under certain circumstances & written clearance to return.
Title
Youth Athletes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#355 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages --Temporarily postponed -HJ 1378 | |
2011-05-06 | Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Health Regulation; Rules -SJ 1117 | |
2011-05-03 | Received -SJ 780 | |
2011-04-28 | In Messages | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 870 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11 | |
2011-04-18 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-13 | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 2 -HJ 659 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/13/11, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-04-06 | Now in Education Committee -HJ 453 | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable by Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 -HJ 452 | |
2011-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee, 04/05/11, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB | |
2011-03-17 | Now in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee -HJ 258 | |
2011-03-16 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-15 | CS by K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 251 | |
2011-03-11 | On Committee agenda-- K-20 Innovation Subcommittee, 03/15/11, 12:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 31 | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; HHS Access Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 31 | |
2011-01-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0730 () 2011-05-06 - Read 2nd time -SJ 1117
S1814 () 2011-03-24 - Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 285
S1814 () 2011-03-24 - Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 285
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0438 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |