FL H0299 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain owner or lessee of motor vehicle to request issuance of license plate decal identifying him or her as organ, tissue, or eye donor; provides requirements for decal; requires DHSMV to issue decal free of charge.
Title
License Plate Decals for Organ Donors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S424 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/299 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/299/BillText/Filed/PDF |