FL H0295 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Child Care Trust Fund within DCF; provides purpose of trust fund; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of the trust fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust Funds/Creation/Child Care Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-03HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-01-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H291 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1942 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1940 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20195Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback