FL H0295 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Calder Sloan Swimming Pool Electrical-Safety Task Force within Florida Building Commission; specifies purpose of task force; requires report to Governor & Legislature; provides for membership; requires Florida Building Commission to provide staff, information, & other assistance to task force; provides for future repeal of task force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calder Sloan Swimming Pool Electrical-Safety Task Force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129)
2016-01-13HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2016-01-12HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 01/12/16, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB
2015-10-30HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-10-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0530 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129)
S0704 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129), CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2016-83)
H0535 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-129, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2016-83)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback