FL H0293 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-55, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-55, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that DOE contract to conduct comprehensive study of states with nationally recognized high-performing middle schools in reading & mathematics; requires report to Governor, SBE & Legislature by specified time; provides for expiration; deletes requirements related to career & education planning course for middle grades promotion; provides appropriation.
Title
Middle Grades
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#41 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#179 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#179 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Chapter No. 2017-55, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116) | |
2017-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 360 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time 764 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-10 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-06 | House | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2017-03-30 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-28 | House | CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-03-14 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0360 (Same As) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55)
H773 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H773 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)