FL H0287 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides legislative findings; requires AG's office, DCF's Substance Abuse & Mental Health Program Office, & FDLE to collect data regarding mitragyna speciosa korth, also known as "Kratom"; provides requirements for data collection; requires report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-04-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/07/15, 10:30 am, Reed Hall -- Temporarily postponed
2015-03-26HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-25HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-24HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2015-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-28HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-01-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0764 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback