FL H0285 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes specified persons to visit county & municipal detention facilities.
Title
Visiting County and Municipal Detention Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-14 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | Reported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable by Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Added to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda |
2022-02-03 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-10-22 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-10-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S178 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary