FL H0281 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1101
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires petitioner challenging assessed value of property before value adjustment board to pay specified percentage of taxes by certain date; requires petitioner challenging denial of classification or exemption, or assessment on specified grounds, before value adjustment board to pay amount of tax which taxpayer admits in good faith to be owing by certain date; provides for penalty if good faith payment is grossly disproportionate to amount of tax found to be due & taxpayer's admission was not made in good faith, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Value Adjustment Boards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#343 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-03 Ordered enrolled -HJ 1101
2011-05-03 Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 731
2011-04-29 Received -SJ 616
2011-04-28 In Messages
2011-04-28 Read 2nd time -HJ 859
2011-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11
2011-04-22 Placed on Calendar -HJ 766
2011-04-21 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-04-20 CS/CS/CS by- Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 -HJ 762
2011-04-18 On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 04/20/11, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2011-04-12 Now in Finance and Tax Committee -HJ 614
2011-04-11 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-04-07 CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 610
2011-04-05 On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2011-03-29 Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 366
2011-03-28 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-03-23 CS by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 341
2011-03-21 PCS on Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/23/11, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 29
2011-02-01 Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee; Finance and Tax Committee -HJ 29
2011-01-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0880 () 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 731

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1920105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
194014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
194034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
194171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
197162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
197323Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback