FL H0277 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates statute of limitations period for civil actions for certain sexual offenses.
Title
Statute of Limitations for Sexual Offenses
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Dan Daley [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] |
Rep. Margaret Good [D] | Rep. Adam Hattersley [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2020-01-09 | House | Withdrawn from Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-10-14 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-10-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H53 (Similar To) 2019-09-20 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1184 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1184 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/277 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/277/BillText/Filed/PDF |