FL H0277 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1964
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1964
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that claim in wrongful death case be presented to DFS within 2 years after claim accrues; provides that failure of DFS or appropriate agency to make final disposition within 90 days after filing is deemed to be final denial of claim; tolls statute of limitations for time taken by DFS or other agency to deny medical malpractice or wrongful death claim; provides that actions for wrongful death against state or one of its agencies or subdivisions must be brought within period applicable to actions brought against other defendants, etc.
Title
Sovereign Immunity
Sponsors
House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Fredrick Costello [R] | Rep. Tom Goodson [R] | House Judiciary Committee |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#197 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1964 | |
2011-04-29 | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs -SJ 593 | |
2011-04-28 | Received -SJ 573 | |
2011-04-27 | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs -SJ 573 | |
2011-04-15 | In Messages | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time -HJ 631 | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/11 | |
2011-03-21 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 265 | |
2011-03-18 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-17 | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 259 | |
2011-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/17/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 29 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/08/11, 8:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2011-02-15 | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee -HJ 149 | |
2011-02-14 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-02-09 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 150 | |
2011-02-02 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/09/11, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 29 | |
2011-01-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0594 () 2011-04-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 593