FL H0273 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Added to Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions related to violations of money services business activities & penalties for such violations; revises provisions related to certain prohibited activities without license; revises requirements for money transmitter or payment instrument seller to conduct business; revises requirements for written contract between money transmitter or payment instrument seller & authorized vendor; provides requirements for money transmitter that receives virtual currency; excludes virtual currency in calculation of permissible investments; revises recordkeeping requirements for money transmitter or payment instrument seller; revises financial liability requirements for money transmitter or payment instrument seller.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Money Services Businesses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2022-01-19HouseBill released to House Calendar
2022-01-19HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2022-01-19HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-03HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-12-03HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-12-03HouseOriginal reference removed: State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-02HouseCS Filed
2021-12-02HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-12-02HouseReported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-12-01HouseFavorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-11-23HouseAdded to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
2021-10-22HouseNow in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-10-22HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-10-22HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-10-22HouseReferred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-10-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S486 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
559952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5602085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560212Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/273
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/273/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/273/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/273/Amendment/305601/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/273/Amendment/941613/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/273/Analyses/h0273.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/273/Analyses/h0273a.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/273/Analyses/h0273b.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/273/Analyses/h0273c.COM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60846&IsPCB=0&BillId=73432
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=62533&IsPCB=0&BillId=73432

Bill Comments

feedback