FL H0271 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases minimum base salary for full-time classroom teachers.
Title
Minimum Base Salary for Full-time Classroom Teachers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S342 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/271 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/271/BillText/Filed/PDF |